EP4093485 - NON-INVASIVE WEARABLE DEVICE FOR ELECTRICAL NERVE STIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stimuli Technology 20 bis rue Barthélémy Danjou 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTON, Yves 6 rue des Buffets 92260 Fontenay aux Roses / FR | 02 /
LE BLAINVAUX, Olivier 7 square Monade 78150 LE CHESNAY / FR | 03 /
LE BLAINVAUX, Pierre 11 rue Neuve Saint Germain 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | 04 /
MARTEL, Tristan L Esperit 19 Route du Nodin 24230 Montcaret / FR | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Axe PI Les Meillières 504 Avenue Colonel Meyère 06140 Vence / FR | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21701273.1 | 19.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021EP50988 | Priority number, date | FR20200000613 | 22.01.2020 Original published format: FR 2000613 | [2022/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021148368 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4093485 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4093485 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/04, A61H39/00, A61N1/36 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
A61N1/36007 (EP,US);
A61H39/002 (EP);
A61N1/0456 (EP,US);
A61N1/0484 (US);
A61N1/3603 (US);
A61H2201/1642 (EP);
A61H2201/165 (EP);
A61H2201/5005 (EP);
A61H2201/5007 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHT-INVASIVE AM KÖRPER TRAGBARE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ELEKTRISCHEN NERVENSTIMULATION | [2022/48] | English: | NON-INVASIVE WEARABLE DEVICE FOR ELECTRICAL NERVE STIMULATION | [2022/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF PORTATIF NON INVASIF DE STIMULATION NERVEUSE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 23.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2016183689 (GOVERNING COUNCIL UNIV TORONTO [CA], et al); | [X]WO2018032105 (GOVERNING COUNCIL UNIV TORONTO [CA]); | [A]US2019117974 (CREASEY GRAHAM HAROLD [US], et al); | [A]WO2020006607 (AGAHARI NICKY [AU]) | by applicant | US9254382 |