EP4100207 - SCREW CLAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNC-Technik Lapp GmbH Nördliche Grünauer Straße 41 86633 Neuburg a.d. Donau / DE | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAPP, Albert Frühlingstraße 30 85114 Buxheim / DE | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Bierschneider, Walter Neubauer - Liebl - Bierschneider - Massinger Münchener Straße 49 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21701469.5 | 20.01.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021EP51150 | Priority number, date | DE202010102910 | 05.02.2020 Original published format: DE102020102910 | [2022/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021156053 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4100207 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B25B5/10, B25B5/16 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
B25B5/102 (EP,US);
B25B5/166 (EP,US);
B25B5/10 (EP);
B25B5/101 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | SCHRAUBZWINGE | [2022/50] | English: | SCREW CLAMP | [2022/50] | French: | SERRE-JOINT À VIS | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 23.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US24194 (CLACKSON, JACK) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 11 - page 2, line 77; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US1587820 (CARTER BERNARD J) [X] 1,5,10 * page 1, line 24 - page 1, line 197; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-4,6-9; | [A]DE8903875U (EMIL LUX GMBH) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 34 - page 8, line 25; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE29800132U (LASCZYK PETER PAUL [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 2 - page 4; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP3168386 (KI EUN KWAN [KR]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0029] - [0069]; figures 2,3,5,7,8,10 *; | [A]US2018243886 (LUCAS CHRIS [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0016] - [0026]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | DE8214309U |