EP4097308 - A WATER SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 27.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AQUA MANAGER APS Esplanaden 40 1263 København K / DK | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELLERT, Jimmi N.J. Fjords Allé 20,3.th 1957 Frederiksberg C / DK | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21701543.7 | 28.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021EP52022 | Priority number, date | EP20200154796 | 31.01.2020 Original published format: EP 20154796 | EP20200201133 | 09.10.2020 Original published format: EP 20201133 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021152036 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4097308 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E03B7/04, E03B7/07, E03C1/05 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
E03B7/04 (EP,US);
G05D23/1393 (US);
E03B7/071 (EP,US);
E03B7/075 (EP,US);
E03B7/078 (EP,US);
E03C1/055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | WASSERVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/49] | English: | A WATER SUPPLY SYSTEM | [2022/49] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN EAU | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 31.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2991481 (BOOK HAROLD M); | [X]DE8128904U (CEIP S R L COSTRUZIONI ELETTRO); | [X]EP0195271 (CROSWELLER & CO LTD W [GB]); | [X]WO03023155 (ANDREOTTI PAOLO [IT]) |