EP3989831 - CLEANING AND CHARGING PORTABLE X-RAY DETECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖPNICK, Johannes c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property and Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HERMANN, Eugen c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property and Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
MAACK, Hanns-Ingo c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property and Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 21702437.1 | 28.01.2021 | [2022/18] | WO2021EP51900 | Priority number, date | EP20200155170 | 03.02.2020 Original published format: EP 20155170 | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021156123 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3989831 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3989831 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, A61L2/18, A61L2/26 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
A61B6/4423 (EP,US);
A61B6/4283 (EP,US);
A61B6/56 (US);
A61L2/18 (EP,US);
A61L2/26 (EP,US);
B08B1/10 (US);
B08B1/12 (EP);
B08B1/143 (EP);
B08B1/16 (EP);
B08B3/08 (US);
A61L2202/122 (EP);
A61L2202/15 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | A61B6/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGEN UND AUFLADEN VON TRAGBAREN RÖNTGENDETEKTOREN | [2022/18] | English: | CLEANING AND CHARGING PORTABLE X-RAY DETECTORS | [2022/18] | French: | NETTOYAGE ET CHARGEMENT DE DÉTECTEURS DE RAYONS X PORTABLES | [2022/23] |
Former [2022/18] | NETTOYAGE ET CHARGE DE DÉTECTEURS PORTABLES DE RAYONS X | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 14.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.10.2022 | AT | 19.10.2022 | CZ | 19.10.2022 | DK | 19.10.2022 | EE | 19.10.2022 | ES | 19.10.2022 | FI | 19.10.2022 | HR | 19.10.2022 | IT | 19.10.2022 | LT | 19.10.2022 | LV | 19.10.2022 | MC | 19.10.2022 | NL | 19.10.2022 | PL | 19.10.2022 | RO | 19.10.2022 | RS | 19.10.2022 | SE | 19.10.2022 | SI | 19.10.2022 | SK | 19.10.2022 | SM | 19.10.2022 | NO | 19.01.2023 | GR | 20.01.2023 | IE | 28.01.2023 | LU | 28.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | IS | 19.02.2023 | PT | 20.02.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
IT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IE | 28.01.2023 | ||
LU | 28.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IE | 28.01.2023 | ||
LU | 28.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
LU | 28.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
LU | 28.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
LU | 28.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 19.10.2022 | |
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 19.10.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1763120 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] ** paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038]; figure - *; | [A]WO2013046915 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0310] - paragraph [0341]; figures 37-43 *; | [A]EP3120775 (RAYENCE CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0088]; figure - * | by applicant | WO2013046915 |