EP4096564 - TOOL FOR A MEDICAL TREATMENT, TOOL TIP, MOVING PART AND/OR HANDPIECE FOR SUCH A TOOL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A TOOL FOR A MEDICAL TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferton Holding S.A. Rue Saint Maurice 34 2800 Delémont / CH | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIENAIMÉ, Alex 140 Rue des Adraits 39220 Les Rousses / FR | 02 /
VUILLET, Romain Forsvägen 10 98192 Kiruna / SE | 03 /
LEBRETON, Etienne Ch de Salette 6 1023 Crissier / CH | 04 /
MOSIMANN, Laurent Chemin du Paradou 6 1291 Commugny / CH | 05 /
BEANI, Florent 1040, chemin des Galas 01170 Gex / FR | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/49] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21702481.9 | 28.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021EP52034 | Priority number, date | EP20200154169 | 28.01.2020 Original published format: EP 20154169 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021152045 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4096564 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61C1/07, A61C17/20, A61C3/03, A61C17/16 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
A61C1/07 (EP);
A61C17/20 (EP,US);
A61C17/16 (EP);
A61C3/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | WERKZEUG FÜR EINE MEDIZINISCHE BEHANDLUNG, WERKZEUGSPITZE, BEWEGLICHES TEIL UND/ODER HANDSTÜCK FÜR SOLCH EIN WERKZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUM PRODUZIEREN SOLCH EINES WERKZEUGS FÜR EINE MEDIZINISCHE BEHANDLUNG | [2022/49] | English: | TOOL FOR A MEDICAL TREATMENT, TOOL TIP, MOVING PART AND/OR HANDPIECE FOR SUCH A TOOL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A TOOL FOR A MEDICAL TREATMENT | [2022/49] | French: | OUTIL POUR UN TRAITEMENT MÉDICAL, POINTE D'OUTIL, PIÈCE MOBILE ET/OU PIÈCE À MAIN POUR UN TEL OUTIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL OUTIL POUR UN TRAITEMENT MÉDICAL | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 19.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Divisional application(s) | EP23152325.9 / EP4186460 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4295827 (MARTIN HOWARD, et al); | [XY]US4492574 (WARRIN GEORGE E [US], et al); | [XY]US4505676 (GONSER DONALD I [US]); | [XY]US5236358 (SIEFFERT WILLIAM J [US]); | [YA]US2003096213 (HICKOK TERESA R [US], et al) |