EP4087855 - AURISTATIN-RELATED COMPOUNDS, CONJUGATED AURISTATIN-RELATED COMPOUNDS, AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CytomX Therapeutics, Inc. 151 Oyster Point Boulevard Suite 400 South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLEYER, Siew C/o Cytomx Therapeutics, Inc. 151 Oyster Point Boulevard, Suite 400 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
MENDELSOHN, Brian, A. C/o Cytomx Therapeutics, Inc. 151 Oyster Point Boulevard, Suite 400 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
CHALLITA-EID, Pia C/o Cytomx Therapeutics, Inc. 151 Oyster Point Boulevard, Suite 400 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 04 /
JACKSON, Dowdy C/o Cytomx Therapeutics, Inc. 151 Oyster Point Boulevard, Suite 400 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 05 /
KEMBALL, Christopher C/o Cytomx Therapeutics, Inc. 151 Oyster Point Boulevard, Suite 400 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 21702784.6 | 06.01.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021US12364 | Priority number, date | US202062957780P | 06.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062957780 P | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021142029 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087855 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/02, C07K16/00, A61K47/68 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
C07K5/0205 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61K47/68 (US);
A61K47/68031 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/6811 (US);
A61K47/6817 (US);
A61K47/6849 (US);
A61K47/6869 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P11/00 (US);
A61P15/00 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/04 (US);
C07K16/28 (US);
C07K16/3069 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2039/545 (US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/76 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Extension states | BA | 21.07.2022 | ME | 21.07.2022 | Validation states | KH | 21.07.2022 | MA | 21.07.2022 | MD | 21.07.2022 | TN | 21.07.2022 | Title | German: | AURISTATIN-VERWANDTE VERBINDUNGEN, KONJUGIERTE AURISTATIN-VERWANDTE VERBINDUNGEN UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/46] | English: | AURISTATIN-RELATED COMPOUNDS, CONJUGATED AURISTATIN-RELATED COMPOUNDS, AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2022/46] | French: | COMPOSÉS ASSOCIÉS À L'AURISTATINE, COMPOSÉS CONJUGUÉS ASSOCIÉS À L'AURISTATINE ET LEURS MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 21.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013066055 (LERCHEN HANS-GEORG [DE], et al); | [A]WO2019068758 (UNIV WIEN BODENKULTUR [AT]) |