EP4096404 - METHODS OF CONTROLLING OR PREVENTING PANAMA DISEASE IN BANANA PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Crop Protection AG Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEROTZKI, Helge Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schaffhauserstrasse 4332 Stein / CH | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | SYNGENTA IP Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21702914.9 | 28.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021EP51949 | Priority number, date | EP20200154534 | 30.01.2020 Original published format: EP 20154534 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021151991 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4096404 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/18, A01N43/20, A01N43/40, A01P3/00 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N37/18 (EP);
A01N43/20 (EP);
A01P3/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG ODER PRÄVENTION DER PANAMA-KRANKHEIT IN BANANENPFLANZEN | [2022/49] | English: | METHODS OF CONTROLLING OR PREVENTING PANAMA DISEASE IN BANANA PLANTS | [2022/49] | French: | MÉTHODES POUR LUTTER CONTRE OU PRÉVENIR LA MALADIE DE PANAMA DANS DES PLANTS DE BANANIERS | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 30.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2013143811 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]); | [YD]WO2015003951 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]); | [Y]WO2015128299 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]); | [Y]WO2016066644 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]); | [Y]WO2019030307 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]); | [Y]WO2019057661 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]WO2019122012 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]); | [Y]WO2019158476 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]); | by applicant | WO2013143811 | WO2015003951 |