EP4100298 - ELECTROMECHANICAL DUAL STEERING SYSTEM FOR A UTILITY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2024/01] |
Former [2022/50] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Jens-Hauke Schützenstrasse 15 42553 Velbert-Neviges / DE | 02 /
KOGAN, Alexander Feldbergstr. 12 51105 Köln / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21702916.4 | 28.01.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021EP51954 | Priority number, date | DE202010103150 | 07.02.2020 Original published format: DE102020103150 | [2022/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021156132 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4100298 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04, B62D7/14 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
B62D5/0481 (EP);
B62D7/148 (US);
B62D5/04 (EP);
B62D5/0421 (US);
B62D5/0445 (US);
B62D5/0484 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMECHANISCHE ZWEIKREISLENKUNG FÜR EIN NUTZFAHRZEUG | [2022/50] | English: | ELECTROMECHANICAL DUAL STEERING SYSTEM FOR A UTILITY VEHICLE | [2022/50] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DIRECTION ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE DOUBLE POUR UN VÉHICULE UTILITAIRE | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 07.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102008022606 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract *; | [AD]DE102012212608 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [AD] 1,12,13 * paragraphs [0030] - [0035]; figures 1-3; claims 1-6 *; | [A]DE102013000898 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,12,13 * paragraphs [0021] - [0025]; figure 1 *; | [XAI]DE102017104667 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME FUER NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,8,9,14 * paragraphs [0012] - [0019] - [0025] - [0029] - [0036] - [0041]; figures 1,5-7; claims 1-10-12 * [A] 5 [I] 7,10-13; | [A]DE102017108378 (SAF HOLLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5* paragraph [0014]; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE19910001 | US2012241244 | DE102012212608 |