EP4097617 - SYSTEMS AND METHOD OF CONTEXTUAL DATA MASKING FOR PRIVATE AND SECURE DATA LINKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Collibra Belgium BV Picardstraat 11 Box 205 1000 Brussels / BE | [2024/09] |
Former [2022/49] | For all designated states Collibra NV Picardstraat 11 B 205 1000 Brussels / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOEL, Satyender 345 E. Ohio St. Apt. 3109 Chicago, IL 60661 / US | 02 /
CHACHRA, Upwan 3604 231st Place SE Bothell, WA 98021 / US | 03 /
CUSHMAN II, James B. 691 Old Compass Road Long Boat Key, FL 34228 / US | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 21703326.5 | 29.01.2021 | [2022/49] | WO2021IB50740 | Priority number, date | US202016776293 | 29.01.2020 Original published format: US202016776293 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021152542 | Date: | 05.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4097617 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/62, H04L29/06 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
G06F21/6254 (EP,IL,KR);
G06F21/6245 (EP,IL,US);
G06F21/6227 (IL,KR,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,IL,KR);
H04L9/0643 (IL,KR,US);
H04L9/3213 (IL,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONTEXTUELLEN DATENMASKIERUNG FÜR PRIVATE UND SICHERE DATENVERKNÜPFUNG | [2022/49] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHOD OF CONTEXTUAL DATA MASKING FOR PRIVATE AND SECURE DATA LINKAGE | [2022/49] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉ DE MASQUAGE DE DONNÉES CONTEXTUELLES POUR LIAISON DE DONNÉES PRIVÉES ET SÉCURISÉES | [2022/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 29.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016283735 (WANG JUN [US], et al); | [XAI]US9998435 (KOTHARI PRAVIN [US], et al); | [A]US2019179888 (SAILLET YANNICK [DE], et al); | [A]WO2019183483 (EQUIFAX INC [US]) |