EP4103890 - AIR PURIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blueair AB Karlavägen 108 115 26 Stockholm / SE | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNBERGER, Lars, Henrik Blueair AB Karlavägen 108 115 26 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
NETHAJI, Alagirisamy Hindustan Unilever Limited Unilever House, BD Sawant Marg, Chakala Mumbai 400 099 Andheri (E) / IN | 03 /
WENNERSTRÖM, Johan, Daniel Blueair AB Karlavägen 108 115 26 Stockholm / SE | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Newbould, Frazer Anthony Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2023/23] |
Former [2022/51] | Newbould, Frazer Anthony Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | Application number, filing date | 21703478.4 | 10.02.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021EP53226 | Priority number, date | IN202021006451 | 14.02.2020 Original published format: IN202021006451 | IN202021006450 | 14.02.2020 Original published format: IN202021006450 | IN202021006452 | 14.02.2020 Original published format: IN202021006452 | IN202021006453 | 14.02.2020 Original published format: IN202021006453 | IN202021006449 | 14.02.2020 Original published format: IN202021006449 | EP20200166873 | 30.03.2020 Original published format: EP 20166873 | EP20200176488 | 26.05.2020 Original published format: EP 20176488 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021160681 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4103890 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4103890 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24F8/10, F24F8/30 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
F24F8/10 (EP);
F24F8/80 (KR,US);
F24F11/77 (US);
F24F11/61 (KR);
F24F8/108 (KR,US);
F24F8/192 (US);
F24F8/30 (EP,KR,US);
F24F8/90 (KR,US);
F24F2013/205 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTREINIGER | [2022/51] | English: | AIR PURIFIER | [2022/51] | French: | PURIFICATEUR D'AIR | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 05.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1245289 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026] * * figure - *; | [I]US2007034082 (ADAIR JOEL E [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]CN105823131 (HEBEI HANGAN INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]WO2018058716 (DAI WEN [CN]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | US2002141131 | US2007034082 | CN105823131 | WO2018058716 |