EP4107461 - HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reaction Engines Limited Building F5 Culham Campus Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 3DB / GB | [2024/36] |
Former [2022/52] | For all designated states Reaction Engines Limited Building F5 Culham Science Centre Abington, Oxfordshire OX14 3DB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VARVILL, Richard c/o Reaction Engines Limited Building F5, Culham Science Centre Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 3DB / GB | 02 /
PARKER, Richard c/o Reaction Engines Limited Building F5, Culham Science Centre Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 3DB / GB | 03 /
DALLIMORE, Samuel c/o Reaction Engines Limited Building F5, Culham Science Centre Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 3DB / GB | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP, et al Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/52] | Sayer, Kathryn Isis Ariel, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road GB-London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21703890.0 | 05.02.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021EP52743 | Priority number, date | GB20200002302 | 19.02.2020 Original published format: GB 202002302 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021165052 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4107461 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/16, B64D33/08 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
F28D7/163 (EP,KR,US);
F28D7/10 (GB,KR);
F28D7/16 (GB);
F28F9/0275 (EP,KR);
F28F2210/02 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2022/52] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER | [2022/52] | French: | ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 18.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 05.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 12.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 12.07.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.07.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2409825 (STATOIL ASA [NO], et al) [X] 1-6,8-16,18-28 * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 25; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP3124906 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,8,10-15,17,19,20,22,23,25-28,30 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2017089643 (ARAFAT YASIR [US]) [X] 1-3,9-13,15,16,22,26-28,30* the whole document *; | [X]RU2680636 (FEDERALNOE GOSUDARSTVENNOE UNITARNOE PREDPRIYATIE TSENTRALNYJ INST AVIATSIONNOGO MOTOROSTROENIYA IME [RU]) [X] 1-6,8-28,30 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-6 *; | [X]WO2019177209 (ENERSOLAR CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-6,8-28,30 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0074]; figures 2,3,4,6 *; | [X]EP3553451 (REACTION ENGINES LTD [GB]) [X] 1,28 * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0172]; figures 4a-5b * |