EP4107096 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONVEYING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KHS GmbH Juchostraße 20 44143 Dortmund / DE | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STENNER, Holger Johannesstraße 69 45721 Haltern am See / DE | 02 /
FAHLDIECK, Andreas Haupersborn 36 55743 Idar-Oberstein / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21704236.5 | 08.02.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021EP52916 | Priority number, date | DE202010104091 | 17.02.2020 Original published format: DE102020104091 | [2022/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021165074 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4107096 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4107096 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65G21/20 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
B65G21/2072 (EP);
B65G47/28 (US);
B65G2201/0235 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEFÖRDERUNG VON BEHÄLTERN | [2022/52] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONVEYING CONTAINERS | [2022/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE TRANSPORT DE CONTENEURS | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 19.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO2010142918 (SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS [FR], et al); | [Y]US2017066596 (WEICKERT MICHAEL [US], et al) | by applicant | EP3063081 |