EP4087433 - UPPER FOR AN ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR HAVING THREE YARN TYPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/46] | UPPER FOR AN ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR HAVING TWO YARN TYPES | ||
[2023/47] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nike Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | [2023/47] |
Former [2022/46] | For all designated states Nike Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINE, Ashleigh S. c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | 02 /
MATTEO, Nicolino c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | 03 /
ACEVES TINAJERO, Juan L. c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 21704629.1 | 08.01.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021US12688 | Priority number, date | US202062958493P | 08.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062958493 P | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021142251 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087433 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4087433 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A43B1/04, A43B23/02, D04B1/12, D04B1/24 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
A43B1/04 (EP,US);
A43B1/028 (US);
A43B23/0205 (EP);
D04B1/123 (EP);
D04B1/24 (EP,US);
D04B1/16 (US);
D10B2331/04 (US);
D10B2401/063 (EP);
D10B2501/043 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/46] | A43B1/04, A43B23/02, D04B1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHAFT FÜR EIN SCHUHWERK MIT DREI GARNTYPEN | [2023/47] | English: | UPPER FOR AN ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR HAVING THREE YARN TYPES | [2023/47] | French: | TIGE POUR ARTICLE DE CHAUSSURE AYANT TROIS TYPES DE FILS | [2023/47] |
Former [2022/46] | SCHAFT FÜR EIN SCHUHWERK MIT ZWEI GARNTYPEN | ||
Former [2022/46] | UPPER FOR AN ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR HAVING TWO YARN TYPES | ||
Former [2022/46] | TIGE POUR ARTICLE DE CHAUSSURE AYANT DEUX TYPES DE FILS | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 07.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP24184526.2 / EP4414488 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US2018042333 (MANOS GULLY ALEXA [US], et al); | [XA]US2018317594 (BRINKMAN ASHLEIGH S [US], et al); | [XA]WO2019147981 (KNITMASTERS LLC [US]); | [XAY]US2019274392 (AMIS SAM [US], et al); | [XA]US2019328075 (POULSEN MONICA M [US], et al) |