Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.05.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
05.05.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
01.03.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.12.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
02.12.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
02.12.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
07.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.09.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.09.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
22.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication |