EP4093479 - BALLOON PROTECTORS AND BALLOON-CATHETER ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. IP Law Group 1 Becton Drive, M/C 110 IP Ops Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRISWOLD, David 13538 Guadalcanal Street Northeast Ham Lake, MN 55304 / US | 02 /
LECY, Cyal 813 Natalie Drive Buffalo, MN 55313 / US | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21705375.0 | 21.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021US14384 | Priority number, date | US202062969900P | 04.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062969900 P | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021158375 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4093479 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/10 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
A61M25/10 (EP,US);
A61M25/0668 (US);
A61M2025/0675 (US);
A61M2025/105 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1068 (US);
A61M2025/1081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | BALLONSCHUTZVORRICHTUNGEN UND BALLONKATHETERANORDNUNGEN | [2022/48] | English: | BALLOON PROTECTORS AND BALLOON-CATHETER ASSEMBLIES | [2022/48] | French: | PROTECTEURS DE BALLONNET ET ENSEMBLES CATHÉTER À BALLONNET | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 23.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US6110146 (BERTHIAUME WILLIAM A [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 4, line 1 - line 47; figures 1,2 * [A] 12-20; | [YA]WO2014179767 (BARD INC C R [US]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1,12 * * paragraph [0036]; figures 4-6 *[A] 11-20 |