EP4136703 - ANTENNA ARRAY WITH INDEPENDENT RFIC CHIP AND ANTENNA ELEMENT LATTICE GEOMETRIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viasat, Inc. Patent Department 6155 El Camino Real Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANSON, Steven Viasat, Inc. c/o Patent Department 6155 El Camino Real Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 21705811.4 | 22.01.2021 | [2023/08] | WO2021US14666 | Priority number, date | US202063011056P | 16.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063011056 P | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021211186 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4136703 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/22, H01Q21/06, H01Q21/00, H01Q21/24 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
H01Q21/065 (EP,IL,US);
H01Q21/24 (EP,IL,US);
H01Q1/2283 (EP,IL,US);
H01Q21/0006 (EP,IL,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Title | German: | ANTENNENANORDNUNG MIT UNABHÄNGIGEN HFIC-CHIP- UND ANTENNENELEMENTGITTERGEOMETRIEN | [2023/08] | English: | ANTENNA ARRAY WITH INDEPENDENT RFIC CHIP AND ANTENNA ELEMENT LATTICE GEOMETRIES | [2023/08] | French: | RÉSEAU D'ANTENNES À PUCE RF INDÉPENDANTE ET GÉOMÉTRIES DE RÉSEAU D'ÉLÉMENTS D'ANTENNE | [2023/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 15.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016261036 (SATO JUNJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0111]; figure 9 *; | [A]US2016359461 (HE XIAOYIN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0036]; figures 3,4 *; | [XAI]WO2019130771 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [X] 1,3,6,9,13 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0100]; figures 13,14 * [A] 2,7,8,10-12,14-20 [I] 4,5; | [A]US10355370 (MCMORROW ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 6 - column 8; figures 3,4 * |