EP4099937 - POWER MANAGEMENT ARCHITECTURE FOR SURGICAL ROBOTIC SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NACLERIO, Edward J. 195 McDermott Road North Haven, Connecticut 06473 / US | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Maschio & Soames IP Ltd 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/50] | Maschio, Antonio Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | Application number, filing date | 21706105.0 | 25.01.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021US14873 | Priority number, date | US202062970776P | 06.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062970776 P | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021158383 | Date: | 12.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4099937 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/30, A61B50/13, A61B90/50, B25J5/00, A61B18/12 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B18/12 (EP);
A61B50/13 (EP,US);
A61B90/50 (EP,US);
B25J19/0025 (US);
B25J19/0029 (EP);
B25J5/007 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSVERWALTUNGSARCHITEKTUR FÜR CHIRURGISCHE ROBOTERSYSTEME | [2022/50] | English: | POWER MANAGEMENT ARCHITECTURE FOR SURGICAL ROBOTIC SYSTEMS | [2022/50] | French: | ARCHITECTURE DE DE GESTION D'ALIMENTATION POUR SYSTÈMES CHIRURGICAUX | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 29.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014071184 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0071] * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP2923661 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [Y] 5,11,18 * paragraph [0212] *; | [XY]US2019201040 (MESSERLY JEFFREY D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-17,19,20 * paragraphs [0381] , [0382] , [0468] , [0477] , [0554] * * figures 1,2,3,8-10,21 * [Y] 5,11,18; | [A]US2019201111 (SHELTON IV FREDERICK E [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 1,2,3,8-10,21 *; | [A]US2019201118 (SHELTON IV FREDERICK E [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 1,2,3,8-10,21 *; | [A]US2019364651 (WILKOLASKI EDWARD [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0034] ** figures 1,2,4B,5-8 * |