EP4093721 - SYNTHESIS OF (E)-1,1,1,4,5,5,5-HEPTAFLUORO-4-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)PENT-2-ENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Chemours Company FC, LLC 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETROV, Viacheslav A. 2 Cappa Court Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | 02 /
JACKSON, Andrew 2 Thomas Lane North Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | 03 /
PENG, Sheng 549 Cabot Drive Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Abitz & Partner, et al Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/48] | Morf, Jan Stefan, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastrasse 17 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21706425.2 | 22.01.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021US14486 | Priority number, date | US202062964674P | 23.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062964674 P | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021150801 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4093721 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/278, C07C17/25, C07C21/18 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
C07C17/278 (EP,KR,US);
C07C17/25 (EP,KR);
B01J27/12 (US);
C07C17/04 (US);
C07C21/18 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/25, C07C21/18 (EP);
C07C17/278, C07C21/18 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | SYNTHESE VON (E) -1,1,1,4,5,5,5-HEPTAFLUOR-4-( ́TRIFLUORMETHYL)PENT-2-EN | [2022/48] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF (E)-1,1,1,4,5,5,5-HEPTAFLUORO-4-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)PENT-2-ENE | [2022/48] | French: | SYNTHÈSE DE (E)1,1,1,4,5,5,5-HEPTAFLUORO-4-(TRIFLUOROMÉTHYL)PENT-2-ÈNE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 28.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Divisional application(s) | EP24160478.4 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]US8148584 (HEDRICK VICKI [US], et al); | [IA]WO2016069242 (CHEMOURS CO FC LLC [US]); | [XI]WO2018224908 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) | by applicant | US3258500 | US4828818 | US5036036 | EP0486333 | WO2008057513 | WO2018022500 |