|
12.10.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
72 |
|
13.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2023 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2023 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
72 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2022 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.09.2022 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.08.2022 |
Information regarding early processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2022 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.07.2022 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.09.2021 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
26.08.2021 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
26.08.2021 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.08.2021 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.05.2021 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
25.05.2021 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.05.2021 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.05.2021 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
22.04.2021 |
Reply to invitation to furnish sequence listing |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.03.2021 |
Invitation to furnish nucleotide and/or Amino Acid Sequence Listing |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.03.2021 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.03.2021 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Communication in Cases for Which No Other Form Is Applicable (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |