Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.10.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
29.09.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] |
21.04.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
21.04.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
11.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
27.02.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.11.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] |
25.11.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
25.11.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] |
31.10.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.08.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.08.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.08.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.08.2022 | Change - representative | |
09.08.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.08.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.08.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
03.03.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication |