EP4111359 - SEMANTIC LABELING OF POINT CLOUD CLUSTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way M/S 169-3IPL Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOTWANI, Payal One Apple Park Way M/S 169 3IPL Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21707464.0 | 26.01.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021US15034 | Priority number, date | US202062982324P | 27.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062982324 P | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021173277 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4111359 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
G06V20/64 (EP,US);
G06F18/214 (US);
G06F18/23 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06T17/00 (US);
G06V20/20 (EP,US);
G06T19/006 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | SEMANTISCHE MARKIERUNG VON PUNKTWOLKEN-CLUSTERN | [2023/01] | English: | SEMANTIC LABELING OF POINT CLOUD CLUSTERS | [2023/01] | French: | MARQUAGE SÉMANTIQUE DE GRAPPES DE NUAGES DE POINTS | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 04.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2017142654 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [I]US2019108639 (TCHAPMI LYNE P [US], et al); | [I]US2019392213 (ULBRICHT DANIEL [US], et al) |