EP4295617 - DESIGN OF A ENERGY SAVINGS MODE OF OPERATION FOR COGNITIVE AUTONOMOUS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANERJEE, Anubhab 80992 Munich / DE | 02 /
MWANJE, Stephen 84405 Dorfen / DE | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Mudge, Kevin Bryers Intellectual Property Ltd Bristol & Bath Science Park Dirac Crescent Emersons Green Bristol BS16 7FR / GB | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 21707644.7 | 19.02.2021 | [2023/52] | WO2021EP54165 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022174918 | Date: | 25.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4295617 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04W84/18, H04W24/02 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H04W52/0206 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04W52/0203 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | ENTWURF EINES ENERGIESPARMODUS FÜR KOGNITIVE AUTONOME NETZWERKE | [2023/52] | English: | DESIGN OF A ENERGY SAVINGS MODE OF OPERATION FOR COGNITIVE AUTONOMOUS NETWORKS | [2023/52] | French: | CONCEPTION D'UN MODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'ÉCONOMIE D'ÉNERGIE POUR DES RÉSEAUX AUTONOMES COGNITIFS | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 19.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2021024059 (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY [FI]) [X] 1,10,13,14,23,26,27 * figure 8 * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0091] * [A] 9,22 [I] 2-8,11,12,15-21,24,25; | [IA] - ANUBHAB BANERJEE ET AL, "RAN Cognitive Controller", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20201020), XP081790970 [I] 1-8,10-21,23-27 * figures 1, 2 * * Sections I, II. * [A] 9,22 | [A] - MWANJE STEPHEN S ET AL, "Environment Modeling and Abstraction of Network States for Cognitive Functions", NOMS 2020 - 2020 IEEE/IFIP NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM, IEEE, (20200420), doi:10.1109/NOMS47738.2020.9110333, pages 1 - 8, XP033777650 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NOMS47738.2020.9110333 |