EP4111065 - COUPLING ELEMENT FOR AN ARTICLE OF FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ovvotech Innovations Limited 17b Lower Faughill Road Jonesborough, Newry County Down BT35 8SQ / GB | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHILLIPS, Sean 17b Lower Foughill Road Jonesborough Newry County Down BT35 8SQ / GB | 02 /
PHILLIPS, Donal 18 Lower Foughill Road Jonesborough Newry County Down BT35 8SQ / GB | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/01] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 21707664.5 | 22.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021EP54284 | Priority number, date | GB20200002910 | 28.02.2020 Original published format: GB 202002910 | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021170526 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4111065 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16B12/12, F16B12/24, F16B13/02, A47B47/04 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
F16B12/24 (EP,US);
F16B13/02 (EP,GB,US);
A47B47/042 (EP,US);
F16B12/125 (EP,US);
F16B21/084 (EP,US);
F16B5/0024 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | KOPPLUNGSELEMENT FÜR EINEN MÖBELGEGENSTAND | [2023/01] | English: | COUPLING ELEMENT FOR AN ARTICLE OF FURNITURE | [2023/01] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'ACCOUPLEMENT POUR UN MEUBLE | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 24.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2233883 (GUIDOBALDI FELIX [FR]); | [X]GB2061371 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS); | [X]US5125442 (HENDRICKSON LESLIE B [US]); | [X]US6651400 (MURPHY TERRY J [US]); | [X]US9810253 (KOELLING FRED [US], et al); | [X]CN207830302U (ZHEJIANG SPRING LIGHTING CO LTD) | by applicant | EP2663212 |