EP4107686 - SYNCHRONISING EVENT STREAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states nChain Licensing AG Grafenauweg 6 6300 Zug / CH | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEE, Andrew James c/o Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP, 7th Floor Churchill House, Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | 02 /
RAND, Ricky Charles c/o Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP, 7th Floor Churchill House, Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/52] | Fraser, Karen Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 21707788.2 | 15.02.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021IB51259 | Priority number, date | GB20200002285 | 19.02.2020 Original published format: GB 202002285 | GB20200020279 | 21.12.2020 Original published format: GB 202020279 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021165815 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4107686 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/36, G06Q20/38, H04L9/00 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G06Q20/36 (EP);
H04L67/60 (KR);
G06F9/466 (US);
G06F9/52 (US);
G06Q20/367 (KR);
G06Q20/38 (EP,KR);
H04L63/00 (EP);
H04L67/02 (KR);
H04L67/565 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | SYNCHRONISIERUNG VON EREIGNISSTRÖMEN | [2022/52] | English: | SYNCHRONISING EVENT STREAMS | [2022/52] | French: | SYNCHRONISATION DE FLUX D'ÉVÉNEMENTS | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 05.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US19960163846 | GB20190007180 |