02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
24.07.2024 |
Change - representative |
|
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
10.11.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
08.11.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.11.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.11.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.07.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.06.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
23.06.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
23.06.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
28.04.2023 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
28.04.2023 |
Change - extension states |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
18.04.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.02.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
02.12.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
02.12.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
07.11.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.09.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.08.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.08.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
17.08.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
03.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|