Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023092745 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021IB51524 | 23.02.2021 | EP20159619 | 26.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220144799 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021IB51524 | 23.02.2021 | EP20159619 | 26.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023515008 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021IB51524 | 23.02.2021 | EP20159619 | 26.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115038485 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021IB51524 | 23.02.2021 | EP20159619 | 26.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4110441 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2023 | C0 | EP4110441 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2023 | B1 | EP4110441 | 04.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021IB51524 | 23.02.2021 | EP20159619 | 26.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112022014726 | 11.10.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2021IB51524 | 23.02.2021 | EP20159619 | 26.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021171182 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20159619 | 26.02.2020 |