EP4110441 - INHALER MOUTHPIECE WITH SEPARATE FLAVOUR AIR CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 12.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change or deletion: representative for unitary effect | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATISTA, Rui Nuno Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/35] | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | ||
Former [2024/04] | Parsi Mendiola, Joshua Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 21707806.2 | 23.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021IB51524 | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 13.12.2023 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/03] | 20.12.2023 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/04] | 20.12.2023 | Date of registration [2024/04] | 13.12.2023 | Date of legal effect [2024/04] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 20.12.2023 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/04] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4110441 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 04 |