EP4111825 - DEVICE FOR MELTING METALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermal Processing Solutions GmbH Schloßstraße 32 5282 Braunau am Inn - Ranshofen / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2024/16] | For all designated states Thermal Processing Solutions GmbH Schloßstraße 32 5282 Branau am Inn - Ranshofen / AT | ||
Former [2023/01] | For all designated states Technische Universität Bergakademie Freiberg Akademiestrasse 6 09599 Freiberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLF, Gotthard Bachstraße 14 40822 Mettmann / DE | 02 /
KESSLER, Andreas Am Wasserhäuschen 01723 Wilsdruff / DE | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes Alfred Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/01] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 21707981.3 | 24.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021EP54553 | Priority number, date | DE202010202484 | 26.02.2020 Original published format: DE102020202484 | [2023/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021170652 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4111825 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/80, H05H1/30 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
H05B6/80 (EP,KR);
H05B7/185 (KR);
H05H1/3405 (US);
C22B9/226 (US);
H05B6/647 (KR);
H05B6/707 (KR);
H05B7/06 (KR);
H05H1/18 (US);
H05H1/32 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHMELZEN VON METALLEN | [2023/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR MELTING METALS | [2023/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FUSION DE MÉTAUX | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 23.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]US6362449 (HADIDI KAMAL [US], et al) [I] 1-3,5,7,9-16 * column 4, line 12 - line 24; figure 1 * * column 6, line 18 - line 41; figures 1-2 * * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 33; figure 3 * [Y] 4,6,8; | [Y]US2005163696 (UHM HAN S [US], et al) [Y] 4,6,8 * paragraph [0010] ** paragraph [0027]; figure 2 * |