EP4103460 - STORAGE STATION FOR SCOOTER, UNITS COMPRISING SAME AND ASSEMBLY COMPRISING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.11.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABADIS SAS 21 rue Robert Vauxion 53000 Laval / FR | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LABADIE, Jean Château de Thuboeuf 53970 NUILLÉ SUR VICOIN / FR | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2024/16] |
Former [2022/51] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 21708283.3 | 12.02.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021FR50255 | Priority number, date | FR20200001421 | 13.02.2020 Original published format: FR 2001421 | [2022/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021160972 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4103460 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4103460 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62H3/00, B62H3/08, B62K3/00 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
B62K3/002 (EP);
B62H3/00 (EP);
B62H3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAGERSTATION FÜR ROLLER, EINHEITEN DAMIT UND ANORDNUNG DAMIT | [2022/51] | English: | STORAGE STATION FOR SCOOTER, UNITS COMPRISING SAME AND ASSEMBLY COMPRISING THEM | [2022/51] | French: | POSTE DE STOCKAGE POUR TROTTINETTE, UNITÉS LE COMPORTANT ET ENSEMBLE LES COMPORTANT | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 05.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE202009000780U (HACKSTEIN FRANK [DE]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]WO2017217929 (NEURON MOBILITY PTE LTD [SG]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3473532 (SOPHIE [FR]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]CN110466368 (NINEBOT BEIJING TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |