EP4295610 - BEAM SWITCHING FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERIKSSON, Erik 585 93 LINKÖPING / SE | 02 /
TIDESTAV, Claes 746 31 BÅLSTA / SE | 03 /
LANDSTRÖM, Anders 961 47 BODEN / SE | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 21709153.7 | 17.02.2021 | [2023/52] | WO2021SE50136 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022177480 | Date: | 25.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4295610 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H04W36/0058 (EP);
H04B7/06952 (US);
H04W16/28 (US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W36/0085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | STRAHLUMSCHALTUNG FÜR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATION | [2023/52] | English: | BEAM SWITCHING FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION | [2023/52] | French: | COMMUTATION DE FAISCEAU POUR COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 21.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2020329405 (AWONIYI-OTERI OLUFUNMILOLA OMOLADE [US], et al); |