EP4103426 - RESOLVING A FAILURE IN COMMUNICATION WITHIN A WIRELESS BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensata Technologies, Inc. 529 Pleasant Street Attleboro, MA 02703 / US | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIGELSFORD, Jonathan M. 529 PLEASANT STREET ATTLEBORO, Massachusetts 02703 / US | 02 /
DENG, Jing 529 PLEASANT STREET ATTLEBORO, Massachusetts 02703 / US | 03 /
ESPAILLAT, Luis 529 PLEASANT STREET ATTLEBORO, Massachusetts 02703 / US | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/51] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 21709286.5 | 08.02.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021US17067 | Priority number, date | US202062976821P | 14.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062976821 P | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021162985 | Date: | 19.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4103426 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60L58/10, H04L1/00, H04W52/00 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
B60L58/10 (EP,US);
H04L1/0015 (EP,US);
H04W52/0245 (EP,US);
H04W52/0251 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T90/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | BEHEBUNG EINES AUSFALLS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN BATTERIEMANAGEMENTSYSTEM EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2022/51] | English: | RESOLVING A FAILURE IN COMMUNICATION WITHIN A WIRELESS BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM OF A VEHICLE | [2022/51] | French: | RÉSOLUTION D'UNE DÉFAILLANCE EN COMMUNICATION DANS UN SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE BATTERIE SANS FIL D'UN VÉHICULE | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 15.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9310601 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 9, line 9 - line 21 *; | [Y]US2006171326 (DURAND ROGER [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 3,4 *; | [Y]EP3536542 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0002] * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP3540844 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0031] ** paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * |