EP4107645 - METHODS, DATA STRUCTURES, AND SYSTEMS FOR ORDERED DATA LOGGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states nChain Licensing AG Grafenauweg 6 6300 Zug / CH | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEE, Andrew James c/o Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | 02 /
RAND, Ricky Charles c/o Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | 03 /
DAVIES, Jack Owen c/o Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/52] | Fraser, Karen Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 21709472.1 | 19.02.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021IB51428 | Priority number, date | GB20200002285 | 19.02.2020 Original published format: GB 202002285 | GB20200020279 | 21.12.2020 Original published format: GB 202020279 | GB20210002314 | 18.02.2021 Original published format: GB 202102314 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021165907 | Date: | 26.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4107645 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/64, H04L29/06 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G06F21/64 (EP,KR);
H04L9/50 (EP,KR);
G06Q20/3678 (US);
G06Q20/223 (US);
H04L63/08 (EP);
H04L63/123 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, DATENSTRUKTUREN UND SYSTEME ZUR GEORDNETEN DATENPROTOKOLLIERUNG | [2022/52] | English: | METHODS, DATA STRUCTURES, AND SYSTEMS FOR ORDERED DATA LOGGING | [2022/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, STRUCTURES DE DONNÉES ET SYSTÈMES D'ENREGISTREMENT CHRONOLOGIQUE DES DONNÉES ORDONNÉ | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 08.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2018215872 (NCHAIN HOLDINGS LTD [AG]); | [A]US2019190697 (CUNICO HERNAN A [US], et al); | [XI]US2020050780 (UHR JOON SUN [KR], et al); | [A]US10565358 (BERTSCH CHRISTOPH [US], et al); | by applicant | GB20200002285 | GB20200020279 |