Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.05.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
19.05.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
03.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.12.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] |
23.12.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
23.12.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] |
29.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.10.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.10.2022 | Change - representative | |
14.10.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.09.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.09.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
12.03.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication |