EP4121470 - COMPOSITIONS BASED ON SILANE-TERMINATED POLYMERS AND ACETYLENE BLACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENNECKE, Klaas Joseph-Weisshaarstrasse 13 79807 Lottstetten / DE | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/04] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 21709741.9 | 10.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021EP56083 | Priority number, date | EP20200163775 | 17.03.2020 Original published format: EP 20163775 | [2023/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021185654 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4121470 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C08G18/48, C08G18/75, C08G18/76, C08K3/04, C09J175/08 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
C09J175/08 (EP);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/4825 (EP);
C08G18/755 (EP);
C08G18/7671 (EP);
C08K3/04 (EP);
C08K2201/006 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L75/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF BASIS VON SILAN-TERMINIERTEN POLYMEREN UND ACETYLEN-RUSS | [2023/04] | English: | COMPOSITIONS BASED ON SILANE-TERMINATED POLYMERS AND ACETYLENE BLACK | [2023/04] | French: | COMPOSITIONS À BASE DE POLYMÈRES À TERMINAISON SILANE ET DE NOIR D'ACÉTYLÈNE | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 17.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]EP1256595 (SIKA AG [CH]) [YD] 1-15* claims 1-9 *; | [XY]EP2151480 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-6,13-15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0022]; claims 1,2 * [Y] 1-15 | by applicant | EP1256595 | EP2151480 | EP3002314 |