Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021160897 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2021 | A3 | WO2021160897 | 19.08.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102020116941 | 26.06.2020 | DE102020104011 | 14.02.2020 | DE102020104705 | 21.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021160895 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020116941 | 26.06.2020 | DE102020104011 | 14.02.2020 | DE102020104705 | 21.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023080681 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020116941 | 26.06.2020 | DE102020104011 | 14.02.2020 | WO2021EP53689 | 15.02.2021 | DE102020104705 | 21.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11966523 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2024 | B2 | US2023031876 | 02.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020116941 | 26.06.2020 | DE102020104011 | 14.02.2020 | WO2021EP53687 | 15.02.2021 | DE102020104705 | 21.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11775091 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2023 | B2 | US2023087434 | 23.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020116941 | 26.06.2020 | DE102020104011 | 14.02.2020 | WO2021EP53688 | 15.02.2021 | DE102020104705 | 21.02.2020 | DE102020117075 | 29.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4104036 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102020116941 | 26.06.2020 | DE102020104011 | 14.02.2020 | WO2021EP53689 | 15.02.2021 | DE102020104705 | 21.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4104035 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020116941 | 26.06.2020 | DE102020104011 | 14.02.2020 | WO2021EP53687 | 15.02.2021 | DE102020104705 | 21.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115176218 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102020116941 | 26.06.2020 | DE102020104011 | 14.02.2020 | WO2021EP53689 | 15.02.2021 | DE102020104705 | 21.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115053207 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102020116941 | 26.06.2020 | DE102020104011 | 14.02.2020 | WO2021EP53688 | 15.02.2021 | DE102020104705 | 21.02.2020 | DE102020117075 | 29.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115052499 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102020116941 | 26.06.2020 | DE102020104011 | 14.02.2020 | WO2021EP53687 | 15.02.2021 | DE102020104705 | 21.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4104039 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020116941 | 26.06.2020 | DE102020104011 | 14.02.2020 | WO2021EP53688 | 15.02.2021 | DE102020104705 | 21.02.2020 | DE102020117075 | 29.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102021103525 | 19.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020116941 | 26.06.2020 | DE102020104011 | 14.02.2020 | DE102020104705 | 21.02.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102021103527 | 19.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020116941 | 26.06.2020 | DE102020104011 | 14.02.2020 | DE102020104705 | 21.02.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021160896 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020116941 | 26.06.2020 | DE102020104011 | 14.02.2020 | DE102020104705 | 21.02.2020 | DE102020117075 | 29.06.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102021103526 | 19.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020116941 | 26.06.2020 | DE102020104011 | 14.02.2020 | DE102020104705 | 21.02.2020 | DE102020117075 | 29.06.2020 |