EP4118282 - PANEL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Champion Link International Corporation OMC Offices Babrow Building 2640 The Valley / AI | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN POYER, Tom No. 111 Chang Jiang Road Jiashan Development area Jiaxing, Zhejiang 314100 / CN | 02 /
BOON, Sven No. 111 Chang Jiang Road Jiashan Development area Jiaxing, Zhejiang 314100 / CN | 03 /
BAERT, Thomas Luc Martine Pijkenaas 1 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 21710492.6 | 11.03.2021 | [2023/03] | WO2021EP56250 | Priority number, date | NL20202025119 | 13.03.2020 Original published format: NL 2025119 | NL20202026795 | 30.10.2020 Original published format: NL 2026795 | [2023/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021180882 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4118282 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/10, E04F15/02, E04F13/08, E04F13/18 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
E04F15/105 (EP,KR);
E04F13/0866 (EP,KR);
E04F13/0894 (EP,KR);
E04F13/18 (EP,KR);
E04F15/02038 (EP,KR);
E04F15/107 (EP,KR);
E04F2203/08 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Validation states | KH | 13.10.2022 | Title | German: | PANEEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PANEELS | [2023/03] | English: | PANEL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PANEL | [2023/03] | French: | PANNEAU ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PANNEAU | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 13.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH0828015 (KAWAI MUSICAL INSTR MFG CO) [Y] 28 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0015] *; | [Y]EP1898025 (KRONOTEC AG [CH]) [Y] 12,13 * figure 3 ** paragraph [0053] *; | [Y]US2009235607 (CHEN ZHAOHONG [CN]) [Y] 7,17,22 * figures 2-3 * * paragraph [0008] *; | [Y]US8544232 (WYBO CARLOS [BE], et al) [Y] 3,6,8,36 * figures 1-2, 14 * * column 5, line 58 - line 60 * * column 10, line 1 - line 2 * * column 6, line 14 - line 21 *; | [Y]WO2014007738 (VAELINGE FLOORING TECHNOLOGY AB [SE]) [Y] 2,4,5,11,14-16,18-21,23,32,35 * figures 2d,3a-3e, 5a-5c, 6b,7a-7c * * page 12, line 6 - line 9 * * page 13, line 3 - line 5 * * page 10, line 8 - line 26 * * page 11, line 15 *; | [Y]US2017217133 (JORDAN ANDREW JONATHAN [US], et al) [Y] 10,27,29,30,33,34 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] *; | [Y]US2018283014 (HODGKINS CLARK [US], et al) [Y] 28 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0109] *; | [XY]EP3536874 (TARKETT GDL SA [LU]) [X] 1,9,24-26,31 * figures 2-3 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0039] * [Y] 2-8,10-23,27-30,32-36 |