Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4117434 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202180020704 EP2021056435W EP21710526 US202117911388



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2023126361Global Dossier 27.04.2023A1
Priority number Date
EP20163137 13.03.2020
WO2021EP56435 13.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN115334885BGlobal Dossier 18.04.2025B
CN115334885 11.11.2022A
Priority number Date
EP20163137 13.03.2020
WO2021EP56435 13.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4117434Global Dossier 18.01.2023A1
Priority number Date
EP20163137 13.03.2020
WO2021EP56435 13.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112022018295 25.10.2022A2
Priority number Date
EP20163137 13.03.2020
WO2021EP56435 13.03.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2021180976Global Dossier 16.09.2021A1
Priority number Date
EP20163137 13.03.2020