Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4107160
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
29.03.2024 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
04.01.2024 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.07.2023 |
First examination report |
|
27.07.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.11.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] |
25.11.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
25.11.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.12.2022 [2022/52] |
07.10.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2022 |
New entry: Fee payment for validation state |
|
28.09.2022 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
16.09.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.09.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.09.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
13.09.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
17.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|