Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023148005 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062978202 | 18.02.2020 | WO2021US18520 | 18.02.2021 | US202117800330 | 18.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220166789 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062978202 | 18.02.2020 | WO2021US18520 | 18.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023513854 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062978202 | 18.02.2020 | WO2021US18520 | 18.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL295662 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062978202 | 18.02.2020 | WO2021US18520 | 18.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115551868 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062978202 | 18.02.2020 | WO2021US18520 | 18.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4107160 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062978202 | 18.02.2020 | WO2021US18520 | 18.02.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022010128 | 04.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US202062978202 | 18.02.2020 | WO2021US18520 | 18.02.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021168074 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202062978202 | 18.02.2020 |