EP4294345 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH A HYDROPHILIC HOT MELT ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | New entry: Observations by third parties | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDNER, Torsten 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | 02 /
ERDEM, Gueltekin Beijing 101312 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Jinyu 40589 Duesseldorf / DE | 04 /
HU, Yuhong 40589 Duesseldorf / DE | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 21710871.1 | 22.02.2021 | [2023/52] | WO2021CN77211 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022174439 | Date: | 25.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4294345 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, C08K5/06, C08L23/08, C09J123/08, A61F13/53, A61F13/539 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
C08L23/0853 (EP);
A61L15/24 (US);
A61F13/15 (EP);
A61F13/53 (EP);
A61F13/539 (EP);
A61L15/58 (US);
C08K5/06 (EP);
C09J123/0853 (EP);
C09J2400/263 (EP);
C09J2400/283 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/06, C08L23/0853 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT EINEM HYDROPHILEN SCHMELZKLEBSTOFF | [2023/52] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH A HYDROPHILIC HOT MELT ADHESIVE | [2023/52] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT AVEC ADHÉSIF THERMOFUSIBLE HYDROPHILE | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 11.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2024 | Observations by third parties | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0800833 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) | by applicant | WO9511652 | US5599335 | WO9748779 | WO0000229 | US6380292 | EP1447066 | US2006024433 | US2008312622 | US2008312617 | US2010051166 | WO2012052172 | WO2012170778 | US2012312491 | other | US5441998 | US9393342 | US2016303275 |