EP4111468 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PREDICTING ALERTNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ResMed Sensor Technologies Limited Nexus UCD Block 9/10 Belfield Office Park Clonskeagh Dublin 4, D04 V2N9 / IE | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHOULDICE, Redmond c/o ResMed Sensor Technologies Limited Nexus UCD Block 9/10, Belfield Office Park, Clonskeagh Dublin 4 D04 V2N9 / IE | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21711036.0 | 27.02.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021IB51652 | Priority number, date | US202062982608P | 27.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062982608 P | US202063018206P | 30.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063018206 P | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021171266 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4111468 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/30 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
G16H50/30 (EP);
A61B5/4806 (US);
A61M16/0003 (US);
A61M16/024 (US);
A61M2016/0027 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE VON WACHSAMKEIT | [2023/01] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PREDICTING ALERTNESS | [2023/01] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉDICTION D'ÉTAT DE VIGILANCE | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 13.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2465434 (ASANOI HIDETSUGU [JP], et al) [X] 145-147,149,151,152 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0390] *[I] 1-48,148,150,153-168 | by applicant | WO2014047310 | US2014088373 | WO2015006364 | WO2016061629 | WO2017132726 | WO2018050913 | WO2019122413 | WO2019122414 | WO2020104465 |