EP4122009 - COMPOSITE CONNECTION OF TWO COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NanoWired GmbH Emanuel-Merck-Strasse 99 64579 Gernsheim / DE | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIRLEM, Olav c/o NanoWired GmbH Emanuel-Merck-Straße 99 64579 Gernsheim / DE | 02 /
DASSINGER, Florian c/o NanoWired GmbH Emanuel-Merck-Straße 99 64579 Gernsheim / DE | 03 /
QUEDNAU, Sebastian c/o NanoWired GmbH Emanuel-Merck-Straße 99 64579 Gernsheim / DE | 04 /
ROUSTAIE, Farough c/o NanoWired GmbH Emanuel-Merck-Straße 99 64579 Gernsheim / DE | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Schwenderling, Jens KEENWAY Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB Postfach 103363 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21711205.1 | 08.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021EP55801 | Priority number, date | DE202010107240 | 17.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020107240 | [2023/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021185617 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4122009 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/488, H01L23/367, H01L23/373, H01L21/60, H01L21/603, H01L21/58, H01L21/56, B23K35/02 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
H01L24/29 (EP,KR);
H01L24/83 (EP,KR);
B23K35/02 (EP);
H01L23/3733 (EP);
H01L23/3737 (EP);
H01L24/30 (EP);
H01L24/32 (EP,KR);
H01L24/33 (EP);
H01L2224/04026 (EP);
H01L2224/05647 (EP);
H01L2224/27462 (EP);
H01L2224/29005 (KR);
H01L2224/29011 (EP);
H01L2224/29012 (EP);
H01L2224/29014 (EP);
H01L2224/29016 (KR);
H01L2224/29076 (EP);
H01L2224/29078 (EP,KR);
H01L2224/29147 (EP);
H01L2224/2919 (EP);
H01L2224/2969 (KR);
H01L2224/30051 (EP);
H01L2224/301 (EP);
H01L2224/30505 (EP);
H01L2224/30517 (EP);
H01L2224/30519 (EP);
H01L2224/3201 (EP);
H01L2224/32106 (EP);
H01L2224/32145 (KR);
H01L2224/33051 (EP);
H01L2224/331 (EP);
H01L2224/33505 (EP);
H01L2224/33517 (EP);
H01L2224/33519 (EP);
H01L2224/83191 (EP);
H01L2224/83193 (EP);
H01L2224/832 (KR);
H01L2224/83203 (EP);
H01L2224/8321 (EP);
H01L2224/8334 (KR);
H01L2224/83447 (EP);
H01L2224/83862 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/05647, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/27462, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/29012, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/29147, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/301, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/3201, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/331, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/83203, H01L2924/00012 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | KOMPOSITVERBINDUNG ZWEIER BAUTEILE | [2023/04] | English: | COMPOSITE CONNECTION OF TWO COMPONENTS | [2023/04] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE COMPOSITE DE DEUX COMPOSANTS | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 05.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006243958 (SUH DAEWOONG [US], et al); | [A]US2007267735 (AWANO YUJI [JP], et al); | [A]US2010052189 (SAKURAI DAISUKE [JP], et al); | [A]US2015259197 (CHAMBION BERTRAND [FR], et al); | [XYI]DE102017104923 (BIRLEM OLAV [DE]); | [XYI]DE102017104922 (BIRLEM OLAV [DE]); | [XYI]DE102017104921 (BIRLEM OLAV [DE]); | [XYI]DE102017104926 (BIRLEM OLAV [DE]); | [XYI]US2019148321 (CHAJI GHOLAMREZA [CA], et al); | [A]WO2019096770 (NANOWIRED GMBH C/O TECHNISCHE UNIV DARMSTADT [DE]) |