Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021285949 | ![]() | 16.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117201518 | 15.03.2021 | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220154743 | ![]() | 22.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56572 | 15.03.2021 | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023518380 | ![]() | 01.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56572 | 15.03.2021 | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023517717 | ![]() | 26.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56575 | 15.03.2021 | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL296385 | ![]() | 01.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56572 | 15.03.2021 | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4121772 | ![]() | 25.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56575 | 15.03.2021 | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115917325 | ![]() | 04.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56572 | 15.03.2021 | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115280154 | ![]() | 01.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56575 | 15.03.2021 | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021238592 | ![]() | 03.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56575 | 15.03.2021 | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021238591 | ![]() | 17.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56572 | 15.03.2021 | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4121771 | ![]() | 25.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56572 | 15.03.2021 | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112022017890 | 01.11.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56575 | 15.03.2021 | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022011577 | 18.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56575 | 15.03.2021 | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022011581 | 18.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56572 | 15.03.2021 | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021185785 | ![]() | 11.11.2021 | A4 | WO2021185785 | 23.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021185784 | ![]() | 25.11.2021 | A4 | WO2021185784 | 23.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3112051 | ![]() | 16.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20163406 | 16.03.2020 | US202063015102 | 24.04.2020 | US202062990171 | 16.03.2020 | EP20179738 | 12.06.2020 | EP21153847 | 27.01.2021 | US202163142370 | 27.01.2021 |