EP3997285 - CONNECTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, ES, RO, SK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfeifer Holding GmbH & Co. KG Dr.-Karl-Lenz-Strasse 66 87700 Memmingen / DE | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEEF, Christoph Anton-Hohl-Straße 8 87758 Kronburg / DE | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 21711527.8 | 09.03.2021 | [2022/20] | WO2021EP55901 | Priority number, date | DE202010203116 | 11.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020203116 | [2022/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021180712 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3997285 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3997285 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E04G21/12 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
E04G21/126 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/19] | English: | CONNECTING DEVICE | [2022/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 10.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XA]FR2591258 (SAUVEPLANE PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1-5,8,9,11 * figures 1,4 * [A] 6,7,10,12; | [XA]EP0819203 (BETOMAX KUNSTSTOFF METALL [DE]) [X] 1,4,8,9,11 * figures 1-32 * [A] 2,3,5-7,10,12; | [A]WO2007031128 (PFEIFER HOLDING GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12* figure 1a *; | [XAI]EP2382363 (PHILIPP GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9,11,12 * figures 1-11 * [A] 3,5,7 [I] 10; | [XAI]EP2773824 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [X] 1,3-9,11,12 * figures 1-8 * [A] 2 [I] 10 | Examination | EP0819203 | EP2773824 | EP2382363 | by applicant | DE3937275 | EP0534475 | EP0914531 | WO03008737 |