EP4147491 - COMMUNICATIONS DEVICES, INFRASTRUCTURE EQUIPMENT AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | For:AL
Sony Europe B.V. The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/11] | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku, Tokyo, 108-0075 / JP | ||
For:AL
Sony Europe B.V. The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Yuxin Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | 02 /
SHARMA, Vivek Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | 03 /
WAKABAYASHI, Hideji Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | 04 /
AWAD, Yassin Aden Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/11] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21711564.1 | 15.03.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021EP56532 | Priority number, date | EP20200173581 | 07.05.2020 Original published format: EP 20173581 | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021223928 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4147491 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/12, H04W48/18 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP,US);
H04W48/02 (US);
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN, INFRASTRUKTURAUSRÜSTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2023/11] | English: | COMMUNICATIONS DEVICES, INFRASTRUCTURE EQUIPMENT AND METHODS | [2023/11] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATION, ÉQUIPEMENT D'INFRASTRUCTURE ET PROCÉDÉS | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 28.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015319701 (NG BOON LOONG [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0146] *; | [A]WO2019194597 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-34 * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0146] *; | [A]US2019349837 (SHIH MEI-JU [TW], et al) [A] 1-34 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] *; | [I]US2019357125 (MILDH GUNNAR [SE], et al) [I] 1-5,12,29-34 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0094] *; | [I]EP3599787 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-34 * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0149] *; | [A] - SONY, "Cell selection/reselection with NPN cells", vol. RAN WG2, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191018, (20191003), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1913363_NPN, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_107bis/Docs/R2-1913363.zip R2-1913363_NPN.doc, (20191003), XP051804230 [A] 1,28 * the whole document * | by applicant | - 3GPP TS 38.470 | - 3GPP TS 38.473 | - "Revised WID: Support of NR Industrial Internet of Things (IoT", 3GPP TSG RAN Meeting #85, Nokia, Nokia Shanghai Bell | - "NR-based Access to Unlicensed Spectrum", 3GPP TSG RAN Meeting #84, Qualcomm, Inc. | - Network as a Service - SA1 Rel-18 Proposal - Motivations & Objectives, Qualcomm, Inc. | EP20200173581 |