EP4085523 - CONTROL OF AN INDUCTION GENERATOR OF A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy Innovation & Technology S.L. Avenida de la Innovación 9-11 31621 Sarriguren (Navarra) / ES | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEPÚLVEDA GONZALEZ, Miguel Ángel C/ Melilla 7, esc 1, 4ºB 28005 Madrid / ES | 02 /
TAPIA PASCAL, Mikel C/ Santa Vicenta María, 3-6A 31012 Pamplona / ES | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/45] | SGRE-Association Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co KG Schlierseestraße 28 81539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21711752.2 | 25.02.2021 | [2022/45] | WO2021EP54731 | Priority number, date | EP20200380010 | 26.02.2020 Original published format: EP 20380010 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021170743 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085523 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02P9/00, H02P9/10, H02P23/08, F03D7/02 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
H02P9/007 (EP);
H02P9/107 (EP,US);
H02P23/08 (EP,US);
F03D7/0272 (EP);
F03D7/0284 (EP);
F05B2270/337 (EP);
H02P2101/10 (EP);
H02P2103/10 (EP);
H02P2207/07 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | STEUERUNG EINES INDUKTIONSGENERATORS EINER WINDTURBINE | [2022/45] | English: | CONTROL OF AN INDUCTION GENERATOR OF A WIND TURBINE | [2022/45] | French: | COMMANDE D'UNE GÉNÉRATRICE ASYNCHRONE D'UNE ÉOLIENNE | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 03.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2011037262 (KRUEGER THOMAS [DE]); | [XI]US2019214927 (LETAS HEINZ-HERMANN [DE]); |