Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4085523
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
16.09.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.07.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.07.2024 |
First examination report |
|
01.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.04.2023 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
28.04.2023 |
Change - extension states |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
01.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.10.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] |
07.10.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
07.10.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] |
31.08.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.08.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.08.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.08.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
05.08.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
01.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|