EP4094326 - CONNECTING ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING A CONNECTING ARRANGEMENT TO A COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Auto-Kabel Management GmbH Im Grien 1 79688 Hausen i.W. / DE | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REDDER, Marie Hauptstr. 276 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | 02 /
SCHARKOWSKI, Oliver Bahnhofsstraße 38 03046 Cottbus / DE | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21712072.4 | 10.03.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021EP56021 | Priority number, date | DE202010108669 | 30.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020108669 | [2022/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021197778 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4094326 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4094326 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/02, H01R4/30, H01R4/34, H01R43/02 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
H01R4/304 (EP);
H01R4/34 (EP,US);
H01R4/023 (EP,US);
H01R4/029 (EP);
H01R43/02 (EP);
H01R2201/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | H01R4/30, H01R4/34, H01R43/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN EINER VERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG MIT EINEM BAUTEIL | [2022/48] | English: | CONNECTING ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING A CONNECTING ARRANGEMENT TO A COMPONENT | [2022/48] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE CONNEXION ET PROCÉDÉ DE RACCORDEMENT D'AGENCEMENT DE CONNEXION À UN COMPOSANT | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 25.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | DK | 26.07.2023 | |
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | DK | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]TW201044727 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,11-15 * figures 1-8 * * abstract * [I] 3,4,6,9,10; | [A]US2015041211 (DEBOCK KIMBERLY [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 ** abstract *; | [A]EP3264533 (JEAN MÜLLER GMBH ELEKTROTECHNISCHE FABRIK [DE]) [A] 1,6,9,10 * figures 1-9 * * columns 1-7 *; | [A]DE102019104318 (AUTO KABEL MAN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 * * abstract * |