Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11799214 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2023 | B2 | US2023129043 | 27.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56021 | 10.03.2021 | DE102020108669 | 30.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115398750 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56021 | 10.03.2021 | DE102020108669 | 30.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4094326 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2023 | B1 | EP4094326 | 30.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56021 | 10.03.2021 | DE102020108669 | 30.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2954564T | 23.11.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56021 | 10.03.2021 | DE102020108669 | 30.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022011232 | 07.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56021 | 10.03.2021 | DE102020108669 | 30.03.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021197778 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020108669 | 30.03.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102020108669 | 29.04.2021 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102020108669 | 30.03.2020 |