Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023100803 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56409 | 12.03.2021 | DE102020107726 | 20.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114981115 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56409 | 12.03.2021 | DE102020107726 | 20.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4121314 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP56409 | 12.03.2021 | DE102020107726 | 20.03.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021185705 | Global Dossier | 23.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020107726 | 20.03.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102020107726 | 23.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020107726 | 20.03.2020 |